CHRISTIAN INITIATIVES IN EARLY YEARS EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conferences, workshops, regular newsletters and a termly magazine Early Days together with meetings and visits offer nurture and support for Early Years practitioners and settings holding Christian values. We advocate a holistic approach to early years care and education. Through social media we build relationships amongst our partners and engage with good practice in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 2014: CIO registration
- CI2EYE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH VIOLET ANDREWS | Chair | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV PETER GEOFFREY MICHELL M THEOL | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev MARY HAWES | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Tamsin Anita Grimmer | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kate Kear | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Msumba | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Brian Andrews | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.83k | £5.17k | £5.73k | £5.59k | £3.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £7.48k | £6.47k | £4.63k | £3.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
100 Heathlands Park
Foxhall Road
Rushmere St. Andrew
IPSWICH
IP4 5TQ
- Phone:
- 07776282829
- Email:
- info@loveearlyyears.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window