Financial history ELEMENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1157932
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £535.05k £277.11k £435.96k £397.05k £197.86k
Total expenditure £458.64k £244.38k £343.99k £391.86k £288.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £22.08k £23.93k
Income from government grants £34.46k £20.71k £19.60k £11.99k £79.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £66.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £16.76k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £452.01k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £94 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £458.64k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A