FORD GREEN HALL MUSEUM LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ford Green Hall Museum offers visitors a fascinating insight into the life in the 17th Century. The rooms are furnished with an outstanding collection of textiles, ceramics and furnature. The Hall welcomes all and appeals to a wide range of ages and encourages schools to visit and take part in activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,910 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 29 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL DAWSON | Chair | 19 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Helen Theresa Reeves-Howard | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Bradbury | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lesley Kelly | Trustee | 02 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.15k | £143.25k | £62.85k | £71.64k | £66.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.69k | £115.27k | £77.20k | £83.02k | £96.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.00k | £100.79k | £37.28k | £30.29k | £23.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/04/2014 as amended on 28 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM. 2) TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ford Green Hall
Ford Green Road
Stoke-on-Trent
Staffs
ST6 1NG
- Phone:
- 01782537696
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window