FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL OSSETT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Holy Trinity exists to provide enhanced resources and educational provision at Holy Trinity Primary School and to offer fun social opportunities to the families of children in school. This year we have held a number of social events including, quiz night, summer fayre and Christmas fayre and make significant financial contributions to school resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 09 June 2014: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Wood | Chair | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Dawson | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Fones | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Smales | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Jane Rollin | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Godfrey | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|||||
LOUISE EMMA LAMB | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JOANNE SHARP | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41k | £3.10k | £1.12k | £2.84k | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.59k | £1.75k | £963 | £2.74k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL OSSETT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity C of E School
Church Street
Ossett
WF5 9DG
- Phone:
- 01924266543
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window