THE EHLERS-DANLOS SUPPORT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Key objectives for the Charity include providing support and guidance to members; growing the membership; increasing awareness of the condition and the charity both amongst the medical community and the general public; promoting/encouraging medical research; and fundraising. 'MAKING OUR INVISIBLE VISIBLE'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 May 2014: Standard registration
- 20 October 2022: Funds received from 1014641 EHLERS-DANLOS SUPPORT UK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Emily Williams | Chair | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jayne Caldwell | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ball | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Jill Harrison | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy Peter de Winter | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Yanina Graciela Aubrey-Gimenez | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laure Francoise Marie Nas De Tourris | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Dominique Myra Lavery | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Cannell | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Roux | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarita Yasmin Aujla | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £446.84k | £406.89k | £483.71k | £423.72k | £380.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £334.34k | £405.50k | £496.38k | £537.08k | £428.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 MAY 2016 as amended on 11 Jun 2022 as amended on 13 May 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM EHLERS-DANLOS SYNDROME AND TO ADVANCE MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE, CURE, PREVENTION OF THE SYNDROME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
45-55 Commercial Street
London
E1 6BD
- Phone:
- 02087365604
- Email:
- info@ehlers-danlos.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window