FATHER'S HEART YOUTH RANCH

Charity number: 1156513
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The ranch aims to help disadvantaged and hurting children, primarily using horses to bring fresh hope and love to their lives. Children spend time learning to care for, communicate with and ride horses, along with other general farm activities. The location is a small, peaceful, rural setting, providing a safe haven for children to have fun and unwind.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £16,723
Total expenditure: £17,722

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Staffordshire
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 April 2014: CIO registration
  • 29 January 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 29 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1195436 HAVEN YOUTH RANCH
  • 29 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1082876 LIVING ROCK TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • FHYR (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £30.42k £27.07k £26.46k £28.43k £16.72k
Total expenditure £29.85k £26.43k £27.31k £27.60k £17.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time