AMI COMMUNITY AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of Poverty, particularly of members of Jewish communities, living or working in Greater Manchester or Cheshire, by providing such persons with vouchers exchangeable for food, or basic household goods, which they could not otherwise afford through lack of means. Any other charitable activity under the law of England and Wales as the trustees see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Bury
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 30 March 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Cope | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
KALMAN KAUFMAN | Trustee | 19 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
YITZCHOK MANTEL | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.59k | £100.59k | £96.20k | £166.44k | £109.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.67k | £96.32k | £103.82k | £161.93k | £108.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £9.99k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/08/2015
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, PARTICULARLY OF MEMBERS OF JEWISH COMMUNITIES, LIVING OR WORKING IN GREATER MANCHESTER OR CHESHIRE, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH VOUCHERS EXCHANGEABLE FOR FOOD, OR BASIC HOUSEHOLD GOODS WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 2. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Leicester Court
Upper Park Road
Salford
M7 4HL
- Phone:
- 07913543422
- Email:
- amicommunityaid@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window