THE PIECE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the environment by the preservation of The Piece Hall as a historic building and advance the education of the public in arts, sciences and history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£6,799,195
Donations and legacies | £1.70m | |
Charitable activities | £5.08m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.71k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,742,866
Raising funds | £32.37k | |
Charitable activities | £6.71m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £450,000 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £32.37k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.71m | |
Retained for future use | £56.33k |
People

131 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
97 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 07 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Orphy Robinson | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Mohammed Illiyas Jaffar | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacqueline Palmer | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Howard Blagbrough | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Nicola Chance-Thompson | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
SYIMA ASLAM | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Noor Ali | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
TIMOTHY JOHN SWIFT | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40m | £3.21m | £2.65m | £4.71m | £6.80m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30m | £3.96m | £2.82m | £4.80m | £6.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £474.00k | £274.00k | £237.00k | £202.00k | £450.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.39k | £875.88k | £248.32k | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £213.32k | £485.98k | £1.39m | £1.42m | £1.70m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.19m | £2.73m | £1.26m | £3.29m | £5.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.82k | £245 | £13 | £3 | £22.71k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.30m | £3.96m | £2.82m | £4.75m | £6.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £46.18k | £32.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £238.14k | £243.25k | £68.55k | £121.45k | £136.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.20m | £1.06m | £976.72k | £977.92k | £1.09m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £407.84k | £476.49k | £953.17k | £875.23k | £842.32k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.72m | £3.39m | £3.95m | £3.96m | £3.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
4.1 THE PROMOTION OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES: 4.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE ACQUISITION, PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF THE PIECE HALL AS OF HISTORIC, CULTURAL, ARCHITECTURAL, CONSTRUCTIONAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST OF EXHIBIT CRAFTSMANSHIP WORTHY OF PRESERVATION; AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE PIECE HALL AND PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARCHITECTURAL, CONSTRUCTIONAL, SCIENTIFIC AND CRAFT FEATURES THEREOF. 4.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF ALL AGES IN ARTS AND SCIENCES, PARTICULARLY PERFORMANCE ARTS, HISTORY, THE INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, OPERATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE PIECE HALL AND ITS SETTING IN HALIFAX AND CALDERDALE; (B) RESEARCH, DISSEMINATION AND EXHIBITION OF MATERIAL TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON THE HERITAGE OF THE PIECE HALL; (C) CREATING EMPLOYMENT AND ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH THE MANAGEMENT, RUNNING AND MAINTENANCE OF THE PIECE HALL BY PROVIDING SERVICES FOR THE PUBLIC; AND (D) PROCURING AND DELIVERING EVENTS FOR THE COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND DISPLAYS OF ART AND CREATING AND MANAGING THE FACILITIES TO DO SO. 4.1.3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUST SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Piece Hall
Piece Hall
BLACKLEDGE
HALIFAX
HX11RE
- Phone:
- 01422525217
- Email:
- info@thepiecehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window