THE HENRY ALLEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to assist with treats and wishes for Children with Cancer and their families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 15 April 2014: CIO registration
- 26 September 2023: Funds received from 1134277 CHELSEA'S ANGELS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM COX | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAWN ALLEN | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK ALLEN | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.45k | £70.45k | £110.47k | £100.06k | £146.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.20k | £83.55k | £113.25k | £135.45k | £144.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 February 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 February 2024 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL ONCOLOGY UNITS:- (I) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE HEALTH BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, RECREATION AND SERVICES ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE DOCTORS, FOR INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS. (II) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND COUNSELLING. (III) TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF CHILD ONCOLOGY PATIENTS BY OFFERING RESPITE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SHORT BREAKS AND HOLIDAYS. (IV) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC RELATING TO LIFE THREATENING DISEASES AND TERMINAL ILLNESS IN CHILDREN INCLUDING THE HOPE AND ENCOURAGEMENT THAT CAN BE FOUND THROUGH BETTER UNDERSTANDING, AND THROUGH SURVIVORS SUCCESS STORIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 HEXHAM GARDENS
BLETCHLEY
MILTON KEYNES
MK3 5EY
- Phone:
- 01908631377
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window