LET THE CHILDREN LIVE!

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Let The Children Live! supports the work of Fundacion Vivan Los Ninos! (Funvini) with street-children and other needy children and young people in Colombia, mainly in the city of Medellin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£533,878
Donations and legacies | £518.54k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £15.33k | |
Investments | £16 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£600,432
Raising funds | £31.77k | |
Charitable activities | £568.66k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £31.77k | |
Charitable expenditure | £568.66k |
People

4 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Colombia
Governance
- 13 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Mary Prosser | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULETTE ROSEMARY BROWN | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN JOHN GOODMAN | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £744.29k | £775.81k | £676.52k | £469.95k | £533.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £673.90k | £617.75k | £680.65k | £622.41k | £600.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.95k | £11.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £731.09k | £753.72k | £651.98k | N/A | £518.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £13.20k | £5.12k | £11.59k | N/A | £15.33k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1 | £22 | £0 | N/A | £16 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £16.95k | £12.95k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £175.68k | £209.57k | £83.69k | N/A | £11.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £644.11k | £592.05k | £654.37k | N/A | £568.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £29.79k | £25.69k | £26.28k | N/A | £31.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.77k | £2.16k | £3.89k | N/A | £5.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £472.12k | £429.71k | £455.00k | N/A | £379.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.64k | £3.10k | £2.33k | N/A | £2.51k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £348.20k | £507.89k | £597.58k | N/A | £387.12k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £229.94k | £232.04k | £235.34k | N/A | £244.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JAN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE STREET-CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN THE REPUBLIC OF COLOMBIA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF SICKNESS, NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SUPPLIES, CLOTHING, FOOD, SHELTER AND IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE FOLLOWING: (I) PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS, AND TO ADVANCE THEIR FORMATION WITHIN THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; (II) FURTHERING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND NATURE OF THE CONDITIONS AND BEHAVIOUR OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, AND INTO THE MEANS OF THEIR IMPROVEMENT; AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (III) PROVISION OF DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION (EDUCATION ON SOCIAL, HEALTH AND ECONOMIC ISSUES), IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN RELATION TO THE CONDITIONS AND BEHAVIOUR OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH DELIVERY OF EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS. 3. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY ASSISTING IN THE PREVENTION OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND DELINQUENCY; AND IN THEIR PROTECTION FROM VIOLENCE, CRUELTY, DANGER OR EXPLOITATION AND OTHER VIOLATIONS OF THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS.
Linked charities
- 13 August 1992 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ROBERTS ROAD
DONCASTER
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
DN4 0JW
- Phone:
- 01302858369
- Email:
- info@letthechildrenlive.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window