THE JAMES AND ADA ROBB CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is the relief of need of persons resident or formerly resident in Birmingham and its surrounding area by reason of youth, age, ill health, disability or financial hardship through the provision of housing and associated amenities.In furtherance of these objects the Trustees own almshouses which consist of 14 self-contained bungalows situated in Bartley Green,Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 08 July 2014: Standard registration
- 25 November 2015: Funds received from 214717 THE JAMES AND ADA ROBB CHARITY
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN GUPWELL | Chair | 01 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
Daniel William Tresigne | Trustee | 18 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
John Roger Lloyd Williams | Trustee | 10 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
NICHOLAS PETER CARL JONES | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SHONA MARY CUTLER | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.52k | £62.12k | £60.22k | £61.61k | £65.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.69k | £35.00k | £41.53k | £42.45k | £43.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/06/2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PERSONS RESIDENT OR FORMERLY RESIDENT IN BIRMINGHAM AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grove Farm Bungalow
Lincomb
Stourport-on-Severn
DY13 9RB
- Phone:
- 07732778524
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window