Financial history SMART CHOICES

Charity number: 1156974
Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £493.90k £192.29k £96.60k £503 £0
Total expenditure £460.92k £207.30k £94.89k £555 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £103.81k N/A N/A N/A