THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH STONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church based in Stone, Staffordshire. Our aims are to spread the Good News of Jesus Christ both in the immediate local community and across the world (through supporting our mission partners). Our church is headed by The Reverend Paul Kingman. We also work actively in our local schools and provide additional support for our local children by employing a Youth Minister. Amen
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 April 2014: Previously excepted registration
- 14 March 2017: Funds received from 214931 THE CHARITY OF MARY GERTRUDE PICKERING
- PCC CHRIST CHURCH STONE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND PAUL HENRY CHARLES KINGMAN | Chair | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
George Frederick Holden | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Pentland | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Juliette Garrington-Miller | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Joan Hallam | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Bruce Williams | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Bakker-Collier | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Abrahams | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Elsie Jane Mason | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jonathan Cuthbert | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marylyn Hillman | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dave Rowlands | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Joseph Kelly | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jean Bowes | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ESTELLA JAYNE WOODHEAD | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER MASON | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHELAGH JANE SANDERS | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD BEAUCHAMP | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stone | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.12k | £107.12k | £83.78k | £92.30k | £135.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.55k | £113.55k | £90.95k | £87.02k | £114.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | £3.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Christ Church
Christchurch Centre
Christchurch Way
STONE
ST158ZB
- Phone:
- 01785811990
- Email:
- office@christchurchstone.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window