ST LAWRENCE JEWRY GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1157187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary purpose of St Lawrence Jewry was to serve and minister to the non-resident daytime population of the City of London by having regular weekly services, weekly recitals, special services and by providing a welcoming space for people to have a quiet time or to pray. The vicar also offered pastoral support to those who are in need. Bibles & other publications were provided for public use.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £252,074
Total expenditure: £175,717

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST LAWRENCE JEWRY GCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Garreth Titley Chair 17 July 2023
TRURO FUND
Received: On time
Charles Edward Lord Trustee 30 May 2023
ONEBODYONEFAITH LTD.
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE THE IRISH SOCIETY
Received: On time
GRESHAM COLLEGE
Received: On time
James St John Davis Trustee 30 May 2023
None on record
Peter John Frederick Jordan Livock Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Robert James Ingham Clark Trustee 14 September 2020
FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET PATTENS CHURCH
Received: On time
ST GEORGE'S ROYAL ARCH CHAPTER NO 5
Received: On time
GILES ADAM STUART GEORGE MURPHY Trustee 14 September 2020
TEMPLE BAR TRUST
Received: On time
GAVIN DOUGLAS LEWIS RALSTON Trustee 14 September 2020
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF SAINT PETER, SAINT PAUL AND ST ANDREW IN PETERBOROUGH
Recently registered
THE CITY CHAPTER AND PERCY TRENTHAM CHARITY
Received: On time
CATHEDRAL MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Roger Arthur Holden Chadwick OBE Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Alderman GREGORY PERCY JONES KC Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
MARTIN COURTENAY CLARKE Trustee 14 September 2020
THE FRIENDS OF OCTAVIA
Received: On time
THE NORLAND FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Alderman Timothy Russell Hailes Trustee 14 September 2020
BRIDEWELL ROYAL HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE LORD MAYOR'S APPEAL
Received: On time
IAN CHRISTOPHER NORMAN Seaton MBE Trustee 14 September 2020
THE CITY CHAPTER AND PERCY TRENTHAM CHARITY
Received: On time
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON CHARITY
Received: On time
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Alderman Robert Charles Hughes-Penney Trustee 14 September 2020
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE FOR SECURITIES AND INVESTMENT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £284.01k £203.69k £204.69k £201.36k £252.07k
Total expenditure £281.90k £224.72k £234.76k £183.47k £175.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £97.50k £123.95k £116.31k £144.28k £123.48k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. LAWRENCE JEWRY C OF E CHURCH
GUILDHALL YARD
LONDON
EC2V 5AA
Phone:
02076009478