EDIBLE YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Edible York supports public gardens for growing vegetables, fruit and herbs, with produce available for anyone to pick. Each Autumn EY organises Abundance to pick and distribute fruit. The charity holds regular events for anyone as an individual or member of a gardening group, such as talks, workshops and visits. The trustees provide information and mentoring to new gardening groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 06 October 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gavin Allen Aitchison | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Reece Geoffrey Jonathan Ford | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Clifford Byrne | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Hansen | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Ruth Jennaway | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MS PENNY BAINBRIDGE | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
MR BILL EVE | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78k | £2.75k | £5.61k | £6.58k | £3.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.36k | £1.95k | £2.35k | £8.22k | £4.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND/OR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, PARTICULARLY THROUGH FACILITATING COMMUNITY GARDENING AND HORTICULTURAL PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Muncastergate
York
YO31 9JX
- Phone:
- 01904422632
- Email:
- info@edibleyork.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window