Financial history SWAN LIFELINE

Charity number: 1156995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £63.78k £50.84k £50.84k £102.18k £42.41k
Total expenditure £104.45k £89.03k £87.45k £109.33k £99.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A