SWAN LIFELINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue and treatment of sick and injured swans. Release back to the wild wherever possible.Education of the public as to pollutants and problems with litter. Training emergency services in swan handling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 09 May 2014: CIO registration
- 23 August 2016: Funds received from 299254 SWAN LIFELINE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Anthony Smulders | Chair | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Helen Wolfe | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Sian Smulders | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.78k | £50.84k | £50.84k | £102.18k | £42.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.45k | £89.03k | £87.45k | £109.33k | £99.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 May 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO RESCUE, PROVIDE SHELTER AND TREATMENT FOR AND OTHERWISE RELIEVE SICK, NEGLECTED AND INJURED SWANS OR ANY OTHER SPECIES OF BIRD THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER TO BE IN NEED OF ATTENTION; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECT OF POLLUTION AND POLLUTANTS ON SWANS AND OTHER WATERFOWL OF THE RIVERS AND WATERWAYS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cuckoo Weir Island
Meadow Lane
Eton
WINDSOR
Berkshire
SL4 6SS
- Phone:
- 01753859397
- Email:
- chairman@swanlifeline.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window