THE RUDOLPH WALKER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation exists to nurture and develop the creative and technical skills and talents of young people by providing them with equipment and facilities which will enable them to produce and distribute audio visual programmes and other types of digital content relating to their culture, history, music and the world in which they live.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £13,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- St Lucia
- Trinidad And Tobago
Governance
- 29 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUDOLPH WALKER CBE | Chair | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr deji adeoshun | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DARREN WALKER | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHEONA WALKER | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ECKERT | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.59k | £8.11k | £22.16k | £24.79k | £47.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.74k | £8.49k | £22.13k | £25.24k | £49.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.75k | N/A | N/A | £13.99k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTION OF THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH CREATIVE AND TECHNICAL ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
154 Wanstead Lane
Ilford
IG1 3SG
- Phone:
- 07973801482
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window