JACKIE'S DROP IN CENTRE

Charity number: 1157193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of a drop in centre providing social and recreational facilities, advice and support for adults with learning disabilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £130,461
Total expenditure: £125,604

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 May 2014: CIO registration
  • 06 September 2019: Funds received from 280415 KESTREL SPORTS CLUB FOR THE DISABLED
  • 24 November 2021: Funds received from 1041800 ROTARY CLUB OF LETCHWORTH TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Harry Lote Chair 24 October 2016
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY AND BALDOCK LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
Peter Alan Wright Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Janice Ward Trustee 11 December 2023
None on record
Shane Willis Trustee 16 August 2022
None on record
David Johnston OBE Trustee 16 August 2022
None on record
Patricia York Trustee 06 January 2017
None on record
ROSEMARY BAILEY Trustee 27 May 2014
None on record
ZOE THEAKSTON Trustee 27 May 2014
None on record
MRS JACKIE NEALON Trustee 27 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.11k £5.52k £64.56k £123.78k £130.46k
Total expenditure £60.38k £23.85k £37.10k £79.09k £125.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Jackies Drop In Centre
Broadway
Letchworth Garden City
Herfordshire
SG6 3PA
Phone:
01462338752