THE JEWISH HOME

Charity number: 1156893
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity seeks to advance the orthodox Jewish faith through Bible teaching and discussions and study of the Bible.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £39,235
Total expenditure: £50,925

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 May 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Aviram Cohen Trustee 06 January 2014
FRIENDS OF ATERET SHAUL
Received: On time
LONDON ACADEMY KOLLEL ABIR YA'ACOV PROJECT
Recently registered
DAVID FRIEDMAN Trustee 06 January 2014
None on record
ESTELLE DOREEN FRIEDMAN Trustee 06 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.55k £22.50k £58.35k £61.58k £39.24k
Total expenditure £23.02k £21.67k £57.72k £51.48k £50.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 February 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 February 2025 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 August 2024 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 August 2024 202 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 May 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 May 2023 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 March 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42 HILLVIEW GARDENS
LONDON
NW4 2JH
Phone:
07853600437
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available