THE EVERGREEN CARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer Projects: Advocacy, Befriending, Chaplaincy & Listening Sevice, Clean Team,Hospital to Home Support, Hand & Nail Care, Friendship Lunch Clubs Paid for Services: Home Support, Wellbeing Wardens(CQC regulated) Campaigns: zero tolerance unsupported discharge home from hospital of older & vulnerable patients without carer/family support; trusted persons bank accounts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
- Rutland
Governance
- 18 August 2014: CIO registration
- 23 February 2017: Funds received from 1121423 THE EVERGREEN CARE TRUST
- 01 March 2017: Funds received from 1076566 STAMFORD HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE (SHYP)
- 06 October 2022: Funds received from 1144216 THE WELL HEAD CENTRE
- 06 October 2022: Funds received from 1144216 THE WELL HEAD CENTRE
- Evergreen Care Stamford & District (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas John Adams | Chair | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roland Marshall Higgins | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Neil James Shaw | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Joanna Rachel Peck | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edward Herniman | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEREK MICHAEL RISK | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE DEBORAH MARSH | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £432.19k | £438.56k | £408.39k | £357.30k | £395.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £450.78k | £411.03k | £364.01k | £360.44k | £440.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £70.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE AND VULNERABLE ADULTS RESIDENT IN STAMFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING SERVICES AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. 2 TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY OR VULNERABLE AND RESIDENT IN STAMFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVISION OF CARERS AND THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO SUCH CARERS. 3 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF ELDERLY PERSONS IN NEED AND VULNERABLE ADULTS IN STAMFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, CARE, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 4 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evergreen Care Trust
Shyp House
1 Barnack Road
STAMFORD
Lincolnshire
PE9 2NA
- Phone:
- 01780765900
- Email:
- office@evergreencare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window