BALLOONS (DEVON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide pre & post bereavement support to children and young people (C&YP) after the death of someone important in their lives. Our support enables them to express and process their grief in their own way and at their own pace. This has a range of positive outcomes including the ability of C&YP to cope, move forward and stay positively engaged in their family and school life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- BALLOONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Pallot | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Lynne Blandford | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annie Monaghan | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Holt | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Campbell | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Stevens | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Thomas | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mitchell Sharp | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Joy Martin | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Bearman | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Hannah Roberts | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BETTS | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.33k | £110.95k | £222.91k | £356.33k | £155.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.30k | £160.51k | £166.35k | £216.00k | £217.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/08/2014 as amended on 14 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH, PRIMARILY IN DEVON, BY PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING IN RESPECT OF PRE AND POST BEREAVEMENT SUFFERED BY CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUNG ADULTS (UP TO 25 YEARS), AND THEIR FAMILIES/CARERS. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PRE AND POST BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR FOR PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS WORKING WITH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUNG ADULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Balloons (Devon)
First Floor
6 Providence Court
Pynes Hill
Exeter
- Phone:
- 01392982570
- Email:
- admin@balloonscharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window