Accounts and annual returns ROLLTHEROCK

Charity Number: 1158834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 13 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 13 May 2025 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 13 May 2025 287 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 13 May 2025 653 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 13 May 2025 653 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 May 2025 1018 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 13 May 2025 1018 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1391 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1391 days