Financial history CONGLETON PLAYERS AMATEUR THEATRE CLUB

Charity Number: 504853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £24.08k £424 £6.85k £28.71k £35.90k
Total expenditure £20.33k £1.08k £10.21k £25.03k £36.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A