Trustees CONGLETON PLAYERS AMATEUR THEATRE CLUB
Charity Number: 504853

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine House | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|||||
ANDREW SALMON | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA McINTYRE | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE CONDLIFFE | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA WEDGBURY | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY BROWN | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE MORRIS | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MASON | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CRYSTAL HOLFORD | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
GLYNIS ALDRED | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVE MCCADDON | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ALLEN | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MCKIE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.