Financial history FUSION FAMILY AND YOUTH PROJECTS

Charity number: 1159563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.79k £40.57k £61.66k £60.14k £79.60k
Total expenditure £68.68k £26.54k £31.54k £66.87k £83.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.83k £7.68k £15.34k £20.37k £23.68k