Trustees ACTS OF KINDNESS

Charity Number: 1157916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Donnan Chair 28 January 2019
None on record
Caroline Baker Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Elizabeth Mary Shaw Trustee 14 November 2022
STUDLEY PRIORY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
NEIL RODERICK BISHOP Trustee 22 July 2013
REDDITCH MISSION AREA
Recently registered
RICHARD STURDEY Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
DIANE ELIZABETH TOLSON Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
REVEREND ROBIN DEREK BAKER Trustee 01 January 2013
FOCUS ON ISRAEL
Recently registered
HOPE AND KINDNESS MINISTRY
Received: On time