Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, RUGBY

Charity Number: 1160223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £115.05k £115.05k £182.27k £212.62k £295.98k
Total expenditure £244.42k £244.42k £228.16k £223.49k £258.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.60k £7.00k £842 N/A N/A