HOME LEONE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a relocation solution for Sierra slum dwellers. Our Christian vision to close slums in 25 years is already being fulfilled, building a pilot village moving the first 2,000 people. An integrated, holistic approach Low cost homes, livelihood, power, water, education healthcare, bound by behaviour change. Also taking your corporate and church teams as part of leadership development/CSR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
- Sierra Leone
- United States
Governance
- 12 August 2014: Standard registration
- HOME LEONE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Martin Fletcher | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Iceton Teal Brecht | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas John Ingram | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clive Douglas Thursfield | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebekah Sarah Massey | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Hyde | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £647.65k | £451.74k | £912.10k | £594.61k | £386.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £549.09k | £448.15k | £864.33k | £662.20k | £399.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £460.56k | N/A | £313.58k | £373.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £598.51k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £138.28k | N/A | £0 | £175.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | £16 | £173 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £48.81k | N/A | £0 | £45.27k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £545.68k | N/A | £859.44k | £652.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.34k | N/A | £4.89k | £9.41k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £4.04k | £6.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.07k | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 APR 2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 2019 as amended on 09 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; (B) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN AFRICA) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (II) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (IV) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP; (V) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESSES OR DEVELOP CURRENT ONES; (VI) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (VII) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; (VIII) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (IX) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (X) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (XI) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES; SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. (C) OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT ARE NOT WITHIN PARAGRAPHS (A) AND (B) BUT ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND MAY REASONABLY BE REGARDED AS ANALOGOUS TO, OR WITHIN THE SPIRIT OF, ANY PURPOSES FALLING WITHIN EITHER PARAGRAPHS (A) AND (B).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park House
Botley Road
Bishops Waltham
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 1DR
- Phone:
- 07961576769
- Email:
- nigel.hyde@homeleone.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window