Financial history THE DANIEL SPARGO-MABBS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £236.29k £134.13k £197.70k £396.63k £361.04k
Total expenditure £206.81k £120.32k £217.62k £268.15k £411.72k
Income from government contracts £2.08k N/A N/A N/A £14.60k
Income from government grants £2.08k £2.03k £375 £16.41k £11.83k