THE WEST SHROPSHIRE TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a weekly talking newspaper and a monthly talking magazine service on USB microstick.web site and internet radio, to app 300 blind or partially sighted in the West Shropshire area. Our newspaper and magazine last up to 90 miniutes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 March 1976: Standard registration
- THE SHROPSHIRE TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- THE WEST SHROPSHIRE TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Winifred Mary Pascoe | Chair | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Lieselotte Clark | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Gwendoline Mary Cox | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher John Lemon | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Alan John Copplestone | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Stephen Leigh Bristow | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL PETER WALLER | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|||||||
STEPHEN RENNIE STEWART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LINDSAY ROWLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAUL EDWARD MAYNARD PASCOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.56k | £4.38k | £5.63k | £7.47k | £4.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.98k | £9.53k | £8.24k | £9.24k | £9.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTIUTION ADOPTED 23RD FEBRUARY 1976 AS AMENDED 25TH APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE VISUALLY IMPAIRED PERSONS AS DEFINED BY THE COPYRIGHT (VISUALLY IMPAIRED PERSON) ACT 2002 AND TO THOSE PERSONS AFFECTED BY SOME OTHER INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY THAT MAKES READING A STRAIN OR IMPOSSIBILITY, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED NEWS AND INFORMATION.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Roy Fletcher Centre
Cross Hill
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1JE
- Phone:
- 01743364726
- Email:
- wstn@btconnect.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window