ARCHIF MENYWOD CYMRU / WOMEN'S ARCHIVE OF WALES

Charity number: 1158204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising awareness of the history of women in Wales; identifying and ensurig the safeguarding, conservation, publicising and making publicly accessible all relevant source materials; carrying out relevant projects and holding public events such as conferences, exhibitions and talks, and by carrying out and/or assisting relevant research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £43,662
Total expenditure: £13,367

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 August 2014: CIO registration
  • 15 January 2015: Funds received from 1090794 ARCHIF MENYWOD CYMRU / WOMEN'S ARCHIVE OF WALES
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • AMC / WAW (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Christine Chapman Chair 28 May 2017
None on record
Wendy Jeanette Evans Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
MARY KATHLEEN THORLEY Trustee 06 October 2019
None on record
SIAN RHIANNON WILLIAMS Trustee 06 October 2019
None on record
Mari Phyllis Ann James Trustee 07 October 2018
None on record
Dinah Evans Trustee 08 October 2016
None on record
SUE THOMAS Trustee 14 August 2014
None on record
CATRIN TUDFIL BEYNON STEVENS Trustee 06 August 2014
None on record
SHAN ALISON ROBINSON Trustee 07 October 2012
None on record
Valerie Wakefield Trustee 05 October 2011
None on record
CAROLINE MARY FAIRCLOUGH Trustee 06 October 2008
None on record
Gail Margaret Allen Trustee 08 October 2001
TREFTADAETH JAZZ CYMRU / JAZZ HERITAGE WALES
Received: On time
Dr ELIN MAIR JONES Trustee 05 October 2001
OUR CHARTIST HERITAGE
Received: On time
JENNY SABINE Trustee 05 October 1998
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.75k £33.44k £14.57k £6.25k £43.66k
Total expenditure £44.75k £36.77k £25.70k £6.49k £13.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
AMC / WAW
c/o Richard Burton Archives
Swansea University
Singleton Park
SWANSEA
SA2 8PP
Phone:
07702956632