THE T.K. MAXX AND HOMESENSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping vulnerable children, young people and their families to achieve their potential in our local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Germany
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 June 2015: Standard registration
- TJX UK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Dunn | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Munnelly | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Joanne Barber | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Erica Michelle Farrell | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH DOLCE | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/02/2020 | 30/01/2021 | 29/01/2022 | 28/01/2023 | 03/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57m | £3.90m | £2.24m | £92.00k | £343.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02m | £2.10m | £1.63m | £1.20m | £2.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.54m | £3.84m | £2.24m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £29.00k | £7.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £53.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £907.00k | £2.10m | £1.63m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £86.00k | £166.00k | £158.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £821.00k | £1.94m | £1.48m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £116.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 February 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JUL 2014 as amended on 29 Mar 2019 as amended on 10 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ALL PURPOSES THAT ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Clarendon Road
Watford
Hertfordshire
WD17 1TX
- Phone:
- 0192347300
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window