The Marcellus Baz Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Boxing coaching and multi-sports activities and provisions - to individuals of various ages across Nottingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 September 2014: CIO registration
- NOTTINGHAM SCHOOL OF BOXING (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcellus Asif Baz | Chair | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fozia Uddin | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Shahbaz Haque | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Pender Jane | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mick McGrath | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOAN SMALLEY | Trustee | 07 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.58k | £204.48k | £104.66k | £146.34k | £266.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.22k | £18.80k | £67.94k | £111.45k | £134.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Sep 2014 as amended on 28 Dec 2021 as amended on 07 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the charity (objects) are, without reference to race, sex, disability, creed or social background, for the benefit of children, young people and adults in Nottinghamshire and other counties in the East Midlands: 1. The advancement of amateur sport for children, young people and adults to participate in boxing and other leisure-time activities so that they might grow to maturity as individuals and trustees of society and so that their conditions of life may be improved 2. To act as a resource for children, young people and adults by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities as a means of: a. advancing in life and helping young people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals; b. advancing education in such ways as the trustees think fit; c. the relief of unemployment for the benefit of the public in such ways as may be thought fit, including assistance to find employment; 3. To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society. (For the purpose of this clause ‘socially excluded’ means being excluded from society, or part of society, as a result of being a member of a socially and economically deprived community).
Contact information
- Address:
-
163 WOODBOROUGH ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 1AX
- Phone:
- 07412 691 466
- Email:
- info@switch-up.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window