OASIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oasis Cardiff is run to assist asylum seekers and refugees arriving in Cardiff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,478,497
Donations and legacies | £151.76k | |
Charitable activities | £1.25m | |
Other trading activities | £64.66k | |
Investments | £378 | |
Other | £8.41k |
Total expenditure:
£1,090,224
Raising funds | £58.09k | |
Charitable activities | £1.03m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £60,664 from 1 government contract(s) and £310,620 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £58.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.03m | |
Retained for future use | £388.27k |
People

26 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
280 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 08 August 2014: CIO registration
- 10 July 2024: Funds received from 1131306 OASIS CARDIFF
- OASIS CARDIFF 1 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Sargent | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Jones-Evans | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Ewen Stuart Campbell McAlpine | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Ruth Morgan | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Vincent Ash-Edwards | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hani Shadad | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JANE MATYUS | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £60.66k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £310.62k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £151.76k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £64.66k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.25m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £378 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.41k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £58.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £29.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £327.93k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £265.03k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £125.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED OR AWAITING REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN THEIR NEW COMMUNITY IN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND RELIGIOUS FAITHS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL/RELIGIOUS GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND RELIGIOUS FAITHS; C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE AND RELIGION. D) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oasis
69B Splott Road
CARDIFF
CF24 2BW
- Phone:
- 02920460424
- Email:
- info@oasiscardiff.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window