KINGSWOOD CHAPEL TRUST

Charity Number: 1158890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust supports the work of Kingswood Meeting House by making the Grade 2 Listed Chapel and Schoolroom available for their use and providing grant funding to assist with ministry and other running costs including living accommodation. The Trust maintains the buildings, adjoining graveyard and grounds. The Chapel is open without discrimination to all members of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £72,043
Total expenditure: £62,885

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Warwickshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Neville White Chair 17 October 2014
WESTHILL ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
Grahame Dallas Berry Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
KIRSTY JINKS Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
David James Slade Trustee 16 October 2015
WESTHILL ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
JOHN ROLAND KAY Trustee 17 October 2014
THE JOAN LAMB CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE OLDBURY CHARITY (INCLUDING THE BENEFACTION OF JOHN PRICE)
Received: On time
THE OLDBURY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAWES MEMORIAL TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Michael Bridgman Trustee 17 October 2014
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Berry Trustee 17 October 2014
None on record
KAREN LEAH BURNS Trustee 17 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £93.33k £96.10k £80.97k £82.30k £72.04k
Total expenditure £93.69k £75.73k £84.34k £79.48k £62.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 29/12/2008
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CHAPEL AND BURIAL GROUND FOR USE FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF UNITARIANISM AS DEFINED IN THE CONSTITUTION OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES; (2) TO ASSIST IN THE PAYMENT OF THE STIPEND OF THE MINISTER AND/OR THE ASSISTANT MINISTER AND ANY RELATED EXPENSES OF SUCH OFFICE; (3) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR THE MINISTER AND/OR THE ASSISTANT MINISTER; AND (4) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION. (5) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECTS ABOVE IT MAY BE APPLIED IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS OF THE MIDLAND UNITARIAN ASSOCIATION (500925) OR THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES (250788). (6) THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE USE FOR THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN SUB-CLAUSE (1) ABOVE, PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO GRANT LEASES OF SUCH PART OF THE PROPERTY UPON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE UNTIL THE LAND SHALL BE REQUIRED FOR OBJECT 1.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 13 July 2011 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
C/O Veale Wasbrough Vizards LLP
PO Box 3501
Bristol
BS2 2FL
Phone:
0121 227 3720
Website:

No information available