Financial history HITCHIN COW COMMONERS TRUST

Charity Number: 1158395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.89k £14 £11.06k £16.11k £15.05k
Total expenditure £1.24k £780 £679 £579 £646
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A