THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF HORTICULTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The authoritative organisation representing those professionally engaged in horticulture in the UK and Ireland. It gives recognition of status within the horticulture industry and the means to network with professionals in all spheres of horticulture. It also provides the opportunity to make an effective contribution to the future of horticulture as well as its importance as a career.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 January 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 10 November 2014: Standard registration
- 19 January 2017: Funds received from 293069 INSTITUTE OF HORTICULTURE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Richardson CHort | Chair | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Jeffries MCIHort | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steven Cotterill CHort | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Thomas Croke CHort | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Frances Mitchell ACIHort | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Edward Leslie Wagstaffe MCIHort | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Keven Manning FCIHort | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Duane Mann MCIHort | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Simpson | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Gilchrist | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
John CAPPALONGA | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Daff | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Gabriel Roe FCIHort | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN NICHOLAS FCIHort | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/01/2020 | 02/01/2021 | 02/01/2022 | 02/01/2023 | 02/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.77k | £259.50k | £137.12k | £141.60k | £149.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.95k | £102.14k | £135.58k | £152.86k | £160.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 January 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 21/07/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECT OF THE INSTITUTE IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HORTICULTURE AND TO PROMOTE THE PRACTICES, RESEARCH, SCIENCE AND ART OF HORTICULTURE AND THE BETTER EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF HORTICULTURISTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Growers Association Ltd
B G A House
Nottingham Road
LOUTH
LN11 0WB
- Phone:
- 03330050181
- Email:
- cih@horticulture.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window