THE VINCENTIAN VOLUNTEERS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees had successfully recruited 4 international volunteers for the year 2021/22, but unfortunately due to previous Covid travel restrictions, we were unable to operate a programme. We were hopeful to operate a shortened version of the programme, for 6 months from January to July 22, but even this was not possible due to the difficulties encountered in trying to obtain visa approvals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 05 May 2015: Standard registration
- 18 August 2016: Funds received from 1053019 VINCENTIAN VOLUNTEER TRUST
- THE VINCENTIAN VOLUNTEER TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Maria Robb | Chair | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Father Chinedu Erasmus Enuh | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dervila Olivia McMorrow | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Theresa Tighe | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Hollingsworth | Trustee | 27 March 2015 |
|
|||||||||
ADRIAN ABEL | Trustee | 31 January 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.17k | £42.70k | £36.42k | £34.50k | £5.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.11k | £36.37k | £34.84k | £21.67k | £31.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 MAY 2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27/03/2015
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO AID IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND OLD AGE BY PROMOTING, ESTABLISHING AND DEVELOPING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO UNDERTAKE OR ASSIST IN COMMUNITY WORK WITHIN ENGLAND WALES AND SCOTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Daughters of Charity
St Wilfred's
4 Birchvale Close
MANCHESTER
M15 5BJ
- Phone:
- 07912179417
- Website:
-
vincentianvolunteers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window