THE ROYAL YACHT SQUADRON ISLE OF WIGHT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the education, and/or promote the development of and/or relieve need in children and young adults living on or as determined by the Trustees having a sufficient connection with the Isle of Wight by such exclusively charitable means as the Trustees think fit particularly by promoting and supporting activities and opportunities with a marine connection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 13 October 2014: Standard registration
- THE SQUADRON IN THE COMMUNITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Ian Arthur Byatt | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Kyle | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Charlton KC | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Laurence Powell OBE | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Nicholson | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
James Stevens | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|||||
THE HON CHRISTOPHER SHARPLES | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MCGRIGOR | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL CARRON SNAGGE | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.70k | £175.11k | £131.45k | £183.44k | £113.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.19k | £24.45k | £94.27k | £278.54k | £67.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUL 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO: 1.1.1 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF; AND/OR 1.1.2 PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF; AND/OR 1.1.3 RELIEVE NEED IN; CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS LIVING ON OR, AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES, HAVING A SUFFICIENT CONNECTION WITH, THE ISLE OF WIGHT BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES WITH A MARITIME CONNECTION.
Area of benefit
HAVING A SUFFICIENT CONNECTION WITH THE ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Yacht Squadron
Cowes Castle
The Parade
COWES
PO31 7QT
- Phone:
- 01983292191
- Email:
- mail@rys.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window