WILTON RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wilton RDA offers the opportunity to disabled people to take part in the sport of horse riding. Our riding centre is in the small town of Wilton in Wiltshire where we have a number of horses suitable for riding by disabled people well supported by volunteers in a sheltered environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
185 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- WILTON RDA (Working name)
- WILTON RIDING FOR DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jacqueline Worrall | Chair | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Adrian Philip Groves | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jean Ward | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Keener Cain | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Cairns | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Frances Bennett | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tricia Drew | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mike Dixon | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MARKING | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.77k | £86.72k | £91.33k | £106.47k | £107.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.20k | £75.44k | £74.66k | £82.68k | £98.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE WILTSHIRE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANGSTONE HOUSE
MORGANS VALE ROAD
REDLYNCH
SALISBURY
SP5 2HY
- Phone:
- 07796871637
- Email:
- pembrokecentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window