RADNOR FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and personal development of young members of the public at large in agriculture, rural life and affairs, international understanding, the environment and related subjects and in the interests of the social welfare of such members, to provide and promote the provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

22 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Powys
Governance
- 27 April 2015: CIO registration
- 28 February 2019: Funds received from 524472 THE RADNOR COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLU...
- RADNOR YFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Jones | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rhian Hughes | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Kate Davies | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Ieuan Griffiths | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Ebony Price | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Lynwen Morgan | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rhys Lewis | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Jon Harris | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Mark Nixon | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Ben Davies | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
RHIAN MEREDYDD DUGGAN | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Jack Nixon | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Gemma Bradford | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Chloe Lewis | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rees Morris | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Swancott | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
William Robert Stanley Lewis | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Hammond | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Avril Susan Hardwick | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Annie Fairclough | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ELLA JAYNE HARRIS | Trustee | 21 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Sian Davies | Trustee | 21 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.41k | £65.63k | £98.81k | £172.83k | £186.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.11k | £69.68k | £96.13k | £182.23k | £182.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £13.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: ? TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, RURAL LIFE AND AFFAIRS, INTERNATIONAL UNDERSTANDING, HOME CRAFTS, THE ENVIRONMENT AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND ? IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS, TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, HEALTH AND WELL- BEING, RAISE AWARENESS, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP AS INDIVIDUALS INTO FULL CITIZENS. ? TO PROMOTE ITS ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE MEDIUMS OF WELSH AND ENGLISH AND TO ENSURE THOSE ACTIVITIES ENHANCE THE MEMBERS’ UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF WELSH RURAL LIFE, WELSH CULTURE AND THE WELSH LANGUAGE, ALONG WITH PROVIDING AN UNDERSTANDING OF OTHER CULTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Radnor YFC Centre Unit 5
Unit 5 Ddole Road Industrial Estate
Llandrindod Wells
Powys
LD1 6DF
- Phone:
- 01597829008
- Email:
- office@radnoryfc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window