GREAT AYCLIFFE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COMMUNITY BUILDING USED FOR VARIOUS ACTIVITIES SUCH AS CUBS, SCOUTS, YOUTH GROUPS, PENSIONERS GROUPS, CHURCH ACTIVITIES, SOCIAL EVENTS AND PARTIES ETC. ALSO USED FOR FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 03 October 2014: CIO registration
- 15 March 2016: Funds received from 1004743 GREAT AYCLIFFE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
- GAVHA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GORDON LEWIS | Chair | 13 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Margaret Lenahan | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Carl Joseph Robinson | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Welsh | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Matthews | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Baker | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Johnson | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARIANA HINDLE | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Harley | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Craft | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.98k | £17.83k | £18.56k | £7.68k | £5.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.15k | £6.30k | £8.15k | £12.94k | £7.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | £14.80k | £16.34k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT AYCLIFFE VILLAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE/VILLAGE HALL AND TO MAINTAIN MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A VILLAGE HALL FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL HAVE POWER TO AFFILIATE TO COMMUNITY MATTERS; DURHAM ASSOCIATION OF YOUTH & COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS (DAYCO)), AND TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 The Green
Aycliffe
Newton Aycliffe
DL5 6LX
- Phone:
- 01325310421
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window