Trustees KINGSTON VOLUNTARY ACTION
Charity Number: 1160403

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL NEWBY | Chair | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Graham | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Wheeler | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Monro | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Archie James Manister-O'Neill | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary McDonald | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tarlochan Johal | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helena Pohl | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR MIKE D'SOUZA | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
RANJIT DHILLON | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.