Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHWOLD AND DISTRICT TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1159987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.37k £6.22k £14.37k £23.09k £29.32k
Total expenditure £12.24k £8.76k £11.08k £21.99k £21.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A