FREEDOM IN CHRIST MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FICMI works to equip church leaders around the world to disciple their members by providing resources for them to use and by training them according to Biblical principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Australia
- Austria
- Brazil
- Canada
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ethiopia
- France
- Germany
- Guinea-bissau
- Hungary
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Liberia
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Switzerland
- Trinidad And Tobago
- United States
- Venezuela
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 21 January 2015: CIO registration
- FICMI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natali Alonso Hernandez | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Tsuma Wanje | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
REVD DR RODNEY DALE WOODS | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Mano Daniel | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith King | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.03k | £148.16k | £239.26k | £235.21k | £352.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.09k | £144.13k | £148.25k | £259.36k | £419.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND CORE VALUES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Beacontree Plaza
Gillette Way
READING
RG2 0BS
- Phone:
- 01183218211
- Email:
- office@freedominchrist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window