Kidneys for Life

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of renal related illnesses and the funding of research and education in renal disease, transplantation and allied fields together with the provision of direct patient amenities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
Governance
- 08 June 1976: Standard registration
- 11 June 2021: Funds received from 702650 LANCASHIRE AND SOUTH CUMBRIA KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOC...
- MANCHESTER INSTITUTE OF NEPHROLOGY AND TRANSPLANTATION (MINT) (Working name)
- KIDNEYS FOR LIFE FUNDRAISING FOR MINT (Previous name)
- KIDNEYS FOR LIFE FUNDRAISING FOR MINT AT THE MRI RENAL UNITS (Previous name)
- MANCHESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY - RENAL UNIT FUND (Previous name)
- MANCHESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY AND BOOTH HALL RENAL UNIT FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Afshin Tavakoli | Chair | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maharajan Raman | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Nixon | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ajay Dhaygude | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Durga Kanigicherla | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amrit Kaur | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Smeeta Sinha | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sandip Mitra | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rachel Lennon-Wolowczyk | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £291.21k | £112.96k | £203.99k | £308.13k | £213.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £306.02k | £134.58k | £168.54k | £292.02k | £251.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 MAY 1976 AND SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1977 AND 1ST SEPT 1983 AS AMENDED BY SIGNED UNDATED, RESOLUTION RECEIVED 4/8/97, AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME 10 MAY 2000 AMENDED ON 12 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 2015 AS AMENDED ON 03 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN PATIENTS WITH KIDNEY COMPLAINTS AND DISORDERS BY: A. THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR PATIENTS OF RENAL UNITS IN HOSPITALS IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES RELATIVE RESPECTIVELY TO THE TREATMENT GIVEN AND THE TREATMENT RECEIVED BY THE AFOREMENTIONED PATIENTS IN RESPECT OF KIDNEY COMPLAINTS AND DISORDERS. B. UNDERTAKING, PROMOTING, DEVELOPING AND ENCOURAGING RESEARCH OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT AND RESEARCH INTO TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF AND PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR CONFERENCES AND WORKSHOPS BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS RELATING TO DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT. C. UNDERTAKING, PROMOTING AND DEVELOPING TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT. D. EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT. E. EDUCATING RENAL STAFF AT HOSPITALS IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES IN DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT THROUGH EDUCATIONAL COURSES, WORKSHOPS AND CONFERENCES BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kidneys for Life
Renal Research
Manchester Royal Infirmary
Oxford Road
Manchester
M13 9WL
- Phone:
- 01612766671
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window