BEESTON COMMUNITY RESOURCE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity manages Middle Street Resource Centre, Beeston, where we provide, and are developing a widening range of support services for people suffering from mental ill-health, social exclusion or other social disadvantages. These include therapeutic activities such as music, crafts and gardening, and courses provided by Nottingham College and other educational and training bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £83,904 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- BCR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Mitchell | Chair | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Craig Alan French | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Curry | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Austin | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Taylor | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Brasier | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Lucille Stephens | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.99k | £282.64k | £175.29k | £179.42k | £331.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.32k | £206.66k | £201.38k | £239.21k | £270.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.65k | £21.60k | £2.04k | £83.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST PEOPLE IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND LEICESTERSHIRE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF MENTAL ILL-HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A RESOURCE CENTRE PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, SOCIAL INTERACTION, EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE DESIGNED TO ASSIST THE RECOVERY AND WELLBEING OF SUCH PEOPLE AND TO ENABLE THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF BROXTOWE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RESOURCE CENTRE
74 MIDDLE STREET
BEESTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 2AR
- Phone:
- 0115 9252516
- Website:
-
beeston-community-resource.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window