GLAMIS HALL FOR ALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Glamis Hall for All provides a community centre and an affordable day centre for people over 50 living in the area who otherwise would be socially isolated or whose carers are in need of respite. We also host a youth club, youth theatre, dance groups, exercise groups, church and an eco group. Regular public events are held throughout the year and our function room is available to hire .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,041 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 February 2015: CIO registration
- GHFA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Saunders | Chair | 04 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Coombe | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gary Leicester Johnson | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Gary Clive Saunders | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Graham Ian Campbell | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Gouffini | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £550.56k | £478.34k | £303.04k | £310.39k | £331.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £422.68k | £285.28k | £314.12k | £393.50k | £366.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £154.13k | N/A | £2.63k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £169.00k | £74.43k | £65.90k | £16.00k | £29.04k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £181.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £19.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £348.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £962 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £410.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £4.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE BOROUGH OF WELLINGBOROUGH, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, DISABILITY, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glamis Hall
Goldsmith Road
Wellingborough
NN8 3RU
- Phone:
- 01933677326
- Email:
- info@glamishall.org.uk
- Website:
-
glamishall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window