Financial history THE SEQUOIA TRUST

Charity Number: 1163457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £51.94m £32.47m £58.77m £13.78m £2.37m
Total expenditure £4.73m £5.43m £80.24m £19.74m £22.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £51.88m £32.47m £58.09m £12.50m £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £63.76k £2.32k £675.26k £1.28m £2.37m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.73m £5.43m £80.24m £19.68m £22.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.01k £12.27k £8.60k £39.00k £216.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.72m £5.42m £0 £0 £22.45m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £59.00k £30.00k